Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6920760 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2005 | B2 | US2004011019 | 22.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00122602 | 17.10.2000 | EP0111842 | 12.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3993823B | Global Dossier | 17.10.2007 | B2 | JP2004515673 | 27.05.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | EP00122602 | 17.10.2000 | EP0111842 | 12.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1327057 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2009 | B1 | EP1327057 | 16.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01982431 | 12.10.2001 | EP00122602 | 17.10.2000 | EP0111842 | 12.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50114915D1 | 09.07.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP00122602 | 17.10.2000 | EP0111842 | 12.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0233225 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00122602 | 17.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1199445 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00122602 | 17.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1325770C | 11.07.2007 | C | CN1447878 | 08.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | EP00122602 | 17.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2324284T | 04.08.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP00122602 | 17.10.2000 |