EP1095879 - Device for handling pouches [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/18] | DEVICE FOR HANDLING POUCHES | ||
[2005/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDAG Gesellschaft für Industriebedarf mbH & Co. Betriebs KG Rudolf-Wild-Strasse 4-6 69214 Eppelheim / DE | [2006/11] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states INDAG GESELLSCHAFT FÜR INDUSTRIEBEDARF MBH & CO. BETRIEBS KG Rudolf-Wild-Strasse 4-6 69020 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wild, Hans-Peter, Dr. Kirchenstrasse 4 6300 Zug / CH | 02 /
Kraft, Eberhard Hebelstrasse 1 74924 Neckarbischofsheim / DE | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00122886.5 | 20.10.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | DE1999152007 | 28.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19952007 | [2001/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1095879 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1095879 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/252, B65B35/16, B65B35/24 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
B65B35/16 (EP,US);
B65G35/00 (KR);
B65B35/24 (EP,US);
B65G47/252 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Handhaben von Beuteln | [2001/18] | English: | Device for handling pouches | [2005/44] | French: | Appareil pour manipuler des sachets | [2005/44] |
Former [2001/18] | DEVICE FOR HANDLING POUCHES | ||
Former [2001/18] | APPAREIL POUR MANIPULER DES SACHETS | Examination procedure | 16.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 27.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 15.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE406807 (GERH AREHNS MEK VERKST AB); | [XY]US3191748 (MARTIN LE ROY L) [X] 1,2,5 * column 2, line 1 - column 4, line 72; figure - * [Y] 6-12; | [Y]US4800703 (GOODMAN JAMES A [US]) [Y] 6-10,12 * column 4, line 42 - column 6, line 68; figure - *; | [Y]EP0700832 (PAAL KG HANS [DE]) [Y] 11 * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 43; figure - *; | [A]US5768856 (ODENTHAL HEINZ F [DE]) | Examination | US5768856 | by applicant | US4108300 |