EP1096254 - Capillary hematocrit separation structure and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics Corporation 9115 Hague Road Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US | [2001/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bhullar, Raghbir S. 6130 Chadsworth Way Indianapolis, IN 46236 / US | 02 /
Wilsey, Christopher D. 516 Oak Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 03 /
Shelton, Jeffrey N. 11305 Hickory Woods Drive Fishers, IN 46038 / US | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Jung, Michael, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Jung, Michael, Dr., et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung 68298 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123020.0 | 24.10.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | US19990428691 | 28.10.1999 Original published format: US 428691 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1096254 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1096254 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | [2001/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1096254 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/49, B01L3/00 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
G01N33/491 (EP,US);
B01L3/502746 (EP,US);
B01L3/502753 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0681 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0825 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0406 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Title | German: | Struktur und Verfahren zur kapillaren Hämatokritabtrennung | [2001/18] | English: | Capillary hematocrit separation structure and method | [2001/18] | French: | Structure et méthode pour la séparation capillaire d'hématocrite | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 19.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.04.2005 | BE | 06.04.2005 | CH | 06.04.2005 | FI | 06.04.2005 | IT | 06.04.2005 | LI | 06.04.2005 | NL | 06.04.2005 | DK | 06.07.2005 | GR | 06.07.2005 | SE | 06.07.2005 | ES | 17.07.2005 | PT | 08.09.2005 | CY | 24.10.2005 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
CY | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
CH | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
LI | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
ES | 17.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 06.04.2005 | |
BE | 06.04.2005 | ||
FI | 06.04.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 06.04.2005 | |
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 06.07.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3693438 (YAMASAKI HIROO, et al) [A] 4,5,13,14* the whole document *; | [A]GB1589690 (ROSEMOUNT INC) [A] 1,4-6,13-15 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4756884 (HILLMAN ROBERT S [US], et al) [DA] 1,7,9,10,12,16,18,19,21 * column 1, line 13 - column 7, line 56 * * column 28, line 21 - line 46 *; | [DA]US5135719 (HILLMAN ROBERT S [US], et al) [DA] 1,12,21 * column 1, line 59 - column 7, line 38 *; | [A]EP0596104 (BIOSITE DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [A] 1,12,21,22 * column 1, line 24 - column 5, line 60 * |