EP1097833 - Method of determining the touch point of an automatically actuated friction clutch in the drive train of a motor vehicle with combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADAM OPEL AG 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [2001/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klösel, Rainer Stettiner Strasse 12 63225 Langen / DE | 02 /
Hangen, Götz Hahnheimer Strasse 15 55578 Wolfsheim / DE | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Daniel, Ulrich W.P., et al Adam Opel AG Patentwesen 80-34 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | Daniel, Ulrich W.P., et al Adam Opel AG Patentwesen 80-34 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | ||
Former [2001/19] | Kümpfel, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Adam Opel AG, Patentwesen / 80-34 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123114.1 | 25.10.2000 | [2001/19] | Priority number, date | DE1999152862 | 03.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19952862 | [2001/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1097833 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1097833 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1097833 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/02, F16D48/06 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
F16D48/06 (EP);
B60W10/02 (EP);
B60W10/04 (EP);
B60W30/18 (EP);
B60W30/1819 (EP);
B60W2510/0628 (EP);
B60W2710/065 (EP);
F16D2500/10412 (EP);
F16D2500/1045 (EP);
F16D2500/3061 (EP);
F16D2500/3067 (EP);
F16D2500/30806 (EP);
F16D2500/30808 (EP);
F16D2500/3111 (EP);
F16D2500/5026 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2001/19] | B60K41/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/26] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ermittlung des Tastpunktes einer automatisch betätigten Reibungskupplung im Antriebsstrang eines Kraftfahrzeuges mit Verbrennungsmotor | [2001/19] | English: | Method of determining the touch point of an automatically actuated friction clutch in the drive train of a motor vehicle with combustion engine | [2001/19] | French: | Méthode de détermination du point de contact d'un embrayage à friction actué automatiquement dans l'arbre de traction d'une automobile à moteur à combustion | [2001/19] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 25.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 25.10.2005 | [2007/34] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0392762 (DIESEL KIKI CO [JP]) [DA] 1 * claim - *; | [A]DE4140328 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [PA]DE19915207 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PA] 1* column 8, line 16 - line 20 * | by applicant | EP0392762 |