EP1201723 - Adhesive foil and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATP Alltape Klebetechnik GmbH ATP-Allee 4 99826 Mihla / DE | [2002/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Jan Dr. rer. nat. Emilienstrasse 15 99817 Eisenach / DE | 02 /
Mertinkat, Jörg Dr. rer. nat. Quellner Strasse 12 21255 Wistedt / DE | 03 /
van Steenbergen, Casper J. Am Kattenbusch 2 42477 Radevormwald / DE | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123129.9 | 25.10.2000 | [2002/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1201723 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02, C09J7/00 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
C09J7/10 (EP,US);
C09J2301/1242 (EP);
C09J2301/208 (EP);
C09J2433/00 (EP);
C09J2475/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2003/04] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Klebstoffolie und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2002/18] | English: | Adhesive foil and method for manufacturing the same | [2002/18] | French: | Feuille adhésive et sa méthode de fabrication | [2002/18] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/32] | 04.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.12.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.12.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4374883 (WINSLOW LOUIS E) [X] 1-4,7,9-11 * claims 1,5 * * column 7, line 58 - line 68 * * example 12 *[A] 14-21; | [X]EP0741005 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-3,7-11,13-15,17,19,20 * claims 1,4,6-8 * * examples 1,2 * * page 3, line 42 - line 49 *; | [XA]EP0801121 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,8-12 * claims 1,2,9 * * example - * * page 3, line 56 - page 4, line 21 * [A] 14-21 |