EP1103301 - Catalytic preparation process of halobenzaldehydes and catalysts to implement the process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Degussa AG 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states Aventis Research & Technologies GmbH & Co KG 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zeyss, Sabine, Dr. An der Ziegelei 6 A 65779 Kelkheim-Fischbach / DE | 02 /
Dingerdissen, Uwe, Dr. Linnéweg 1 64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | 03 /
Riermeier, Thomas, Dr. Moselstrasse 7 65439 Flörsheim / DE | 04 /
Centi, Gabriele, Prof. Contrada Fra Paolo Compl. Sofi 3/C 98158 Faro Superiore-Messina / IT | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/22] |
Former [2001/22] | Ackermann, Joachim, Dr. Postfach 11 13 26 60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123190.1 | 26.10.2000 | [2001/22] | Priority number, date | DE1999157416 | 29.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19957416 | [2001/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1103301 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/00, B01J23/887, C07C45/36, C07C47/55 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
C07C45/36 (EP);
B01J23/002 (EP);
B01J23/887 (EP);
B01J23/8871 (EP);
B01J23/8872 (EP);
B01J23/8876 (EP);
B01J2523/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/36, C07C47/55 (EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/842 (EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/53, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/842 (EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/54, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/842 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/08] |
Former [2001/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur katalytischen Herstellung von Halogenbenzaldehyden und Katalysatoren zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [2001/22] | English: | Catalytic preparation process of halobenzaldehydes and catalysts to implement the process | [2001/22] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation catalytique des benzaldéhydes halogénés et les catalyseurs pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé | [2001/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 15.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/22] | 05.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2257571 (MONTEDISON SPA [IT]) [X] 7-13 * example 4; claim 1 *; | [X]US3904552 (O'HARA FRANCIS JOSEPH) [X] 7-12 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0009239 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]US5136104 (SAITO NOBORU [JP], et al); | [A]EP0501104 (GUTEHOFFNUNGSHUETTE MAN [DE]); | [X]EP0639553 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [X] 7-12 * claim 1; tables 1-31 *; | [D]EP0723949 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [X]DE19502805 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-10,12-14 * claims 1-15 * |