23.10.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
04.01.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] |
15.09.2007 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
22.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.06.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
02.06.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.02.2007 |
First examination report |
|
01.02.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.06.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] |
23.06.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.09.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.07.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.06.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2003 |
First examination report |
|
12.03.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.06.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] |
05.10.2001 |
Publication of search report |
published on 21.11.2001 [2001/47] |
05.10.2001 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.11.2001 [2001/47] |
21.06.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.05.2001 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
08.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.04.2001 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
02.03.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.04.2001 [2001/16] |
02.03.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.04.2001 [2001/16] |
14.11.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|