Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8462876 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2013 | B2 | US2009310652 | 17.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10685308 | 21.04.2008 | US42717303 | 01.05.2003 | US8709102 | 28.02.2002 | US76615301 | 19.01.2001 | US28032899 | 29.03.1999 | US15517393 | 22.11.1993 | US62525496 | 01.04.1996 | US54610209 | 24.08.2009 | US85952297 | 20.05.1997 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7580475 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2009 | B2 | US2008192808 | 14.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10685308 | 21.04.2008 | US42717303 | 01.05.2003 | US8709102 | 28.02.2002 | US76615301 | 19.01.2001 | US28032899 | 29.03.1999 | US15517393 | 22.11.1993 | US62525496 | 01.04.1996 | US85952297 | 20.05.1997 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7362793 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2008 | B2 | US2005047483 | 03.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42717303 | 01.05.2003 | US8709102 | 28.02.2002 | US76615301 | 19.01.2001 | US28032899 | 29.03.1999 | US15517393 | 22.11.1993 | US62525496 | 01.04.1996 | US85952297 | 20.05.1997 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3796721B | Global Dossier | 12.07.2006 | B2 | JPH10502505 | 03.03.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US9508562 | 16.06.1995 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1085342 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP95926635 | 16.06.1995 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0767976 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2002 | B1 | EP0767976 | 17.05.2000 | A4 | EP0767976 | 16.04.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9508562 | 16.06.1995 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU686858B | Global Dossier | 12.02.1998 | B2 | AU3094295 | 25.01.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US9508562 | 16.06.1995 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1093185 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2001 | A3 | EP1093185 | 18.04.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP95926635 | 16.06.1995 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE223113T | 15.09.2002 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9508562 | 16.06.1995 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9508146 | 05.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9508562 | 16.06.1995 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2136408 | 11.01.2000 | C | CA2136408 | 23.05.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15517393 | 22.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2193843 | 14.11.2000 | C | CA2193843 | 11.01.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9508562 | 16.06.1995 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19581691T | 19.06.1997 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9508562 | 16.06.1995 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69527964T | 27.03.2003 | T2 | DE69527964D1 | 02.10.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9508562 | 16.06.1995 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0767976T | 06.01.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US9508562 | 16.06.1995 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK174844B | 15.12.2003 | B1 | DK145296 | 26.02.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US9508562 | 16.06.1995 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI965223 | 26.02.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US9508562 | 16.06.1995 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9700017 | 31.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US9508562 | 16.06.1995 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ290255 | 26.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US9508562 | 16.06.1995 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE525117 | 30.11.2004 | C2 | SE0301545L | 27.05.2003 | L | SE0301545D0 | 27.05.2003 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US9508562 | 16.06.1995 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE525806 | 03.05.2005 | C2 | SE0401974L | 03.08.2004 | L | SE0401974D0 | 03.08.2004 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US9508562 | 16.06.1995 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE521161 | 07.10.2003 | C2 | SE9604711L | 21.02.1997 | L | SE9604711D0 | 20.12.1996 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US9508562 | 16.06.1995 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6400756 | 04.06.2002 | B2 | US2001024466 | 27.09.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76615301 | 19.01.2001 | US28032899 | 29.03.1999 | US15517393 | 22.11.1993 | US62525496 | 01.04.1996 | US85952297 | 20.05.1997 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6563860 | 13.05.2003 | B2 | US2002080858 | 27.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8709102 | 28.02.2002 | US76615301 | 19.01.2001 | US28032899 | 29.03.1999 | US15517393 | 22.11.1993 | US62525496 | 01.04.1996 | US85952297 | 20.05.1997 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5422908 | 06.06.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US15517393 | 22.11.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5633889 | 27.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US15517393 | 22.11.1993 | US62525496 | 01.04.1996 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5659572 | 19.08.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US15517393 | 22.11.1993 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5926502 | 20.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US15517393 | 22.11.1993 | US62525496 | 01.04.1996 | US85952297 | 20.05.1997 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6256340 | 03.07.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US28032899 | 29.03.1999 | US15517393 | 22.11.1993 | US62525496 | 01.04.1996 | US85952297 | 20.05.1997 | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9600991 | Global Dossier | 11.01.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1086871C | 26.06.2002 | C | CN1158187 | 27.08.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1173482C | 27.10.2004 | C | CN1392674 | 22.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1173483C | 27.10.2004 | C | CN1392675 | 22.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1173484C | 27.10.2004 | C | CN1392676 | 22.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1177412C | 24.11.2004 | C | CN1393999 | 29.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1306717C | 21.03.2007 | C | CN1394000 | 29.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1315346C | 09.05.2007 | C | CN1596011 | 16.03.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2144383T | 01.03.2003 | T3 | ES2144383T | 16.06.2000 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1055022 | 11.03.2005 | B | HK1055022 | 19.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1055023 | 11.03.2005 | B | HK1055023 | 19.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1055024 | 11.03.2005 | B | HK1055024 | 19.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1055025 | 20.07.2007 | B | HK1055025 | 19.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1055026 | 18.03.2005 | B | HK1055026 | 19.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1072677 | 02.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26676994 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Earlier application | EP0767976 |