EP1087372 - Sound source system based on computer software and method of generating acoustic data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1 Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2007/27] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken 430 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masuda, Hideyuki c/o Yamaha Corporation, 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken, 430 / JP | 02 /
Isozaki, Yoshimasa c/o Yamaha Corporation, 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken, 430 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Hideo c/o Yamaha Corporation, 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken, 430 / JP | 04 /
Hirano, Masashi c/o Yamaha Corporation, 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken, 430 / JP | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Ascherl, Andreas, et al KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Ascherl, Andreas, et al Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Straße 9 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/13] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwaltskanzlei Günther Kehl Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123550.6 | 28.08.1997 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | JP19960246942 | 30.08.1996 Original published format: JP 24694296 | JP19960248592 | 30.08.1996 Original published format: JP 24859296 | JP19970017333 | 14.01.1997 Original published format: JP 1733397 | [2001/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1087372 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1087372 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G10H7/00, G10H1/18 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
G10H5/007 (EP,US);
G10H1/0066 (EP,US);
G10H1/186 (EP,US);
G10H7/006 (EP,US);
G10H2210/225 (EP,US);
G10H2230/041 (EP,US);
G10H2240/056 (EP,US);
G10H2240/241 (EP,US);
G10H2240/301 (EP,US);
G10H2250/535 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2001/13] | Title | German: | Auf Software basiertes Tonquellensystem und Verfahren zur Erzeugung von akustischen Wellenformdaten | [2001/13] | English: | Sound source system based on computer software and method of generating acoustic data | [2001/13] | French: | Système générateur de son utilisant un logiciel et méthode de génération de formes d'onde acoustiques numériques | [2001/13] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 13.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.04.2015 | 20.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/23] | 30.01.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/23] | 21.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97114933.1 / EP0827132 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970114933) is 26.05.2000 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 16.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 22.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2001 | 31.08.2014 | 18   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5432293 (NONAKA TASUYA [JP], et al); | [A]WO9618995 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) | by applicant | WO8001215 | EP0337458 | US5376752 | WO9618995 |