EP1096675 - Piezoelectric resonator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2007/37] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ando, Akira, (A170) Intellectual Property Dept. Murata Manufact.Co.,Ltd., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 02 /
Kimura, Masahiko, (A170) Intel. Property Dept. Murata Manufact.Co.,Ltd., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 03 /
Sawada, Takuya, (A170) Intel. Property Dept. Murata Manufact.Co.,Ltd., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 04 /
Inoue, Jiro, (A170) Intel. Property Dept. Murata Manufact.Co.,Ltd., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 05 /
Kaida, Hiroaki, (A170) Intel. Property Dept. Murata Manufact.Co.,Ltd., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 06 /
Nagae, Toru, (A170) Intel. Property Dept. Murata Manufact.Co.,Ltd., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123560.5 | 27.10.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | JP19990308785 | 29.10.1999 Original published format: JP 30878599 | JP20000323782 | 24.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000323782 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1096675 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1096675 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1096675 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/17 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
H03H9/177 (EP,US);
H03H9/15 (KR);
H03H9/0207 (EP,US);
H03H9/178 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/45] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Piezoelektrischer Resonator | [2001/18] | English: | Piezoelectric resonator | [2001/18] | French: | Résonateur piézoélectrique | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 20.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 27.10.2009 | FR | 02.11.2009 | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/35] | FR | 02.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5885613 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-6* abstract *; | [X]DE3822906 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * page 2, line 29 * * page 3, lines 26-38 * * page 4, lines 25-28 * * figure 3 *; | [X]JPH05243898 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [X] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A] - ONO M ET AL, "THIRD-OVERTONE RESONATOR USING THICKNESS LONGITUDINAL MODE OF 36o Y-LINBO3", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART II - ELECTRONICS, WILEY, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, (199907), vol. 82, no. 7, PART 2, ISSN 8756-663X, pages 50 - 58, XP000930122 [A] 1-6 * abstract * * figures 4a,b,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6432(199907)82:7<50::AID-ECJB7>3.0.CO;2-K |