07.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
23.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
22.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
22.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |
15.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] |
25.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
16.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] |
09.04.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
19.03.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
20.11.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] |
06.11.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] |
30.10.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] |
01.05.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
29.04.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.04.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.03.2009 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
10.12.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.11.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.11.2008 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.10.2008 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.10.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.09.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.05.2008 |
First examination report |
|
17.05.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.10.2007 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
25.10.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.03.2003 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] |
28.02.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] |
22.11.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.07.2002 |
Publication of search report |
published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] |
17.03.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] |
09.11.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|