EP1099521 - Machine knife consisting of a knife and a back late [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GFE-Gesellschaft für Fertigungstechnik und Entwicklung e.V. Am Bad 2 98574 Schmalkalden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states GFE-Gesellschaft für Fertigungstechnik, und Entwicklung e.V. Am Bad 2 98574 Schmalkalden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feik, Wolfhard Talstrasse 92 09117 Chemnitz / DE | 02 /
Gebert, Andreas Arthur-Strobel-Strasse 22 09127 Chemnitz / DE | 03 /
Peuckert, Klaus Kanzler Strasse 3 09112 Chemnitz / DE | [2001/43] |
Former [2001/20] | 01 /
Feik, Wolhard Talstrasse 92 09117 Chemnitz / DE | ||
02 /
Gebert, Andreas Arthur-Strobel-Strasse 22 09127 Chemnitz / DE | |||
03 /
Peuckert, Klaus Kanzler Strasse 3 09112 Chemnitz / DE | Representative(s) | Seerig & Hübner Patentanwälte Am Alten Bad 6 09111 Chemnitz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Seerig & Hübner Patentanwälte Am Alten Bad 6 09111 Chemnitz / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123783.3 | 02.11.2000 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | DE1999154155 | 10.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19954155 | [2001/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1099521 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1099521 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B27C1/00 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
B27C1/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/20] | Title | German: | Maschinenmesser, bestehend aus einem Messer und einer Klappe | [2001/20] | English: | Machine knife consisting of a knife and a back late | [2001/20] | French: | Couteau de machine comprenant lame et plaque de support | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 02.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/45] | 22.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.01.2003 | 30.11.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02245302 ; | [A]JPH0483824 ; | [A]US3783917 (MOCHIZUKI N) [A] 1-9 * column 3, lines 24-50; figures 5,6 *; | [X]JPS55164101 (KANEFUSA KNIFE & SAW) [X] 1-5,9 * figure 5 *; | [X]US4252163 (ONDA HIROTSUGA, et al) [X] 1-5,8,9 * column 1, lines 11-45; figure 12 *; | [AD]DE4419996 (GFE GES FUER FERTIGUNGSTECHNIK [DE]) [AD] 1-5* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901218), vol. 014, no. 570, Database accession no. (M - 1060), & JP02245302 A 19901001 (KANEFUSA HAMONO KOGYO KK) [A] 1-5,8,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920706), vol. 016, no. 304, Database accession no. (C - 0959), & JP04083824 A 19920317 (HITACHI KOKI CO LTD) [A] 1-5,8 * abstract * |