21.11.2008 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
03.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] |
13.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] |
23.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] |
19.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] |
17.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
15.09.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] |
23.06.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] |
05.05.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
24.02.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
11.11.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] |
28.10.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] |
04.03.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] |
04.02.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.02.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.11.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.07.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.03.2004 |
First examination report |
|
18.03.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.11.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.12.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.04.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
28.12.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 13.02.2002 [2002/07] |
30.03.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] |
30.03.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] |