EP1099502 - Flying shears for cutting metal strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2001/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grafe, Horst Talsperrenstrasse 3 57271 Hilchenbach / DE | 02 /
Loth, Volker Bismarkweg 17 57258 Freudenberg / DE | 03 /
Merz, Jürgen Kärntner Strasse 9a 57223 Kreuztal / DE | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard Patentanwälte Hemmerich & Kollegen Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hemmerich & Kollegen, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123811.2 | 02.11.2000 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | DE1999153906 | 10.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19953906 | [2001/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1099502 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1099502 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23D25/12 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
B23D25/12 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4708 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4711 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4833 (EP,US);
Y10T83/8737 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9457 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/07] |
Former [2001/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Hochgeschwindigkeitsschere zum Querteilen von insbesondere dünnem Walzband | [2001/20] | English: | Flying shears for cutting metal strip | [2001/20] | French: | Cisaille volante pour couper des bandes métalliques | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 22.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 20.04.2005 | FR | 20.04.2005 | IE | 20.04.2005 | NL | 20.04.2005 | TR | 20.04.2005 | DK | 20.07.2005 | GR | 20.07.2005 | SE | 20.07.2005 | PT | 20.09.2005 | CY | 02.11.2005 | BE | 30.11.2005 | CH | 30.11.2005 | LI | 30.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
IE | 20.04.2005 | ||
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
TR | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
CY | 02.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FR | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
IE | 20.04.2005 | ||
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
TR | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
CY | 02.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
IE | 20.04.2005 | ||
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
TR | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
IE | 20.04.2005 | ||
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
TR | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
IE | 20.04.2005 | ||
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
TR | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/42] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
IE | 20.04.2005 | ||
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
IE | 20.04.2005 | ||
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
IE | 20.04.2005 | ||
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 20.07.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH05123919 ; | [AY]DE464803 (DEMAG AG) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 22 - line 54; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3-8; | [Y]US4004479 (BODNAR ERNEST ROBERT) [Y] 8 * column 4, line 4 - line 32; figure 4 *; | [Y]US4402240 (MOYER ROSS A [US]) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 51 - line 66 *; | [DY]US5207138 (SATO HISASHI [JP], et al) [DY] 6,7 * column 9, line 23 - line 59; figures 13-15 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930907), vol. 017, no. 493, Database accession no. (M - 1475), & JP05123919 A 19930521 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * |