EP1098118 - Seal for plug valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Babin, Christopher John 1554 Oakridge Drive Rochester Hills, Michigan 48307 / US | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/19] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123919.3 | 03.11.2000 | [2001/19] | Priority number, date | US19990435978 | 08.11.1999 Original published format: US 435978 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1098118 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1098118 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16K5/04 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
F16K5/0464 (EP,US);
F16K5/0264 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86823 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86863 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/07] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Dichtung für einen Hahn | [2001/19] | English: | Seal for plug valve | [2001/19] | French: | Joint d'étanchéité pour robinet | [2001/19] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 03.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/50] | 27.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2310583 (JOHNSON CHARLES F) [Y] 1-6,9 * figures 1-6 * * column 3, line 49 - line 55 *; | [A]US3698687 (KITAMURA MASARU) [A] 1,9* figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US3916950 (MONGERSON PAUL A, et al) [Y] 1-6,9 * abstract *; | [A]US4815704 (BERCHEM RUTGER [DE]) [A] 1,3-6 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 42 - line 46 * * column 2, line 57 - line 62 *; | [A]US4883253 (HASHIMOTO MITSUHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1,9 * figures 1-5 * |