EP1085506 - Spindle-shaped goethite particles containing cobalt and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TODA KOGYO CORPORATION 1-2, Funairi-minami 4-chome, Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Toda Kogyo Corporation 1-2, Funairi-minami 4-chome, Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | ||
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states TODA KOGYO CORP. 7-1 Yokogawa-Shinmachi Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okinaka, Kenji 56-4, Tsumasakikaisaku Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 02 /
Ota, Yasutaka 12-23-101, Kairouen 2-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [2001/16] |
Former [2001/12] | 01 /
Okinaka, Kenji 9-6, Misuzuen, Itsukaichi-cho, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Ota, Yasutaka 12-23-101, Kairouen 2-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. Gray's Inn 14 South Square London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00124081.1 | 02.05.1995 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | JP19940332611 | 13.12.1994 Original published format: JP 33261194 | JP19940332612 | 13.12.1994 Original published format: JP 33261294 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1085506 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/706, C01G49/06 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01G49/06 (EP,US);
B22F1/062 (EP,US);
G11B5/70621 (EP,US);
C01P2002/54 (EP,US);
C01P2002/60 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2004/10 (EP,US);
C01P2004/54 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2004/84 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2001/12] | Title | German: | Spindelförmige Goethit-Teilchen, die Kobalt enthalten, und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [2001/12] | English: | Spindle-shaped goethite particles containing cobalt and process for producing the same | [2001/12] | French: | Particules de goethite sous forme d'une broche contenant du cobalt et et procédé pour sa préparation | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 04.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/25] | 17.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95303005.3 / EP0717397 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0377933 (TODA KOGYO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * page 5, line 37 - page 7, line 6; claims 7-13 ** page 7, line 22 - page 8, line 35 *; | [A]EP0466338 (TODA KOGYO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * page 4, line 29 - line 32 * * page 5, line 23 - line 37 * * page 5, line 55 - page 6, line 57 * * page 7, line 36 - line 43 * * page 10, line 10 - line 32; table 3 *; | [A]EP0515748 (TODA KOGYO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * page 2, line 1 - line 6 * * claims 1-9 * |