EP1205233 - Process for flue gas purification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hellmich, Friedrich Holtkampweg 13 32278 Kirchlengern / DE | [2002/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2002/20] | Specht, Peter, Dipl.-Phys., et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 00124093.6 | 07.11.2000 | [2002/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1205233 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1205233 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/06, B01D53/68, B01D53/74, B01D53/08 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
B01D53/08 (EP);
B01D53/74 (EP);
B01D2258/0233 (EP);
B01D2258/0283 (EP);
B01D2259/40088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/06] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rauchgasreinigung | [2002/20] | English: | Process for flue gas purification | [2002/20] | French: | Procédé pour la purification de gaz de fumée | [2002/20] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 03.11.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 06.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.06.2003 | [2007/35] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4555391 (CYRAN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 8 * * column 4, lines 30-48 * * column 5, lines 58-64; figure .; example 1 *; | [A]US4590049 (STAUDINGER GERNOT [AT]) [A] 1-4* column 2, lines 2-12; claim 1 *; | [A]US4782772 (CHUGHTAI YAQUB [DE], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 3; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0293688 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 6 * * column 18, line 55 - column 21, line 58; figure . *; | [X]EP0463367 (GEN ELECTRIC ENVIRONMENT [US]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 15 * * column 4, lines 7-12 * * column 6, lines 5-28; figure 2 *; | [X]RU2108138 (NTTS EHKOSORB, et al) [X] 1 * abstract * |