EP1113304 - Apparatus for the optical scanning of several objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/27] | Device for optical scanning of multiple objects | ||
[2001/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Microsystems Heidelberg GmbH Am Friedensplatz 3 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2001/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engelhardt, Johann Schiessmauerweg 6 76669 Bad Schönborn / DE | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Reichert, Werner Franz Leica Microsystems GmbH Corporate Patents and Trademarks Postfach 20 20 35530 Wetzlar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Reichert, Werner F., Dr. Leica Microsystems AG, Konzernstelle Patente + Marken, Postfach 20 20 35530 Wetzlar / DE | Application number, filing date | 00124105.8 | 07.11.2000 | [2001/27] | Priority number, date | DE1999157413 | 29.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19957413 | [2001/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1113304 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1113304 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1113304 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
G02B21/0076 (EP,US);
G02B21/0036 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/27] | G02B26/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/20] |
Former [2001/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum optischen Abtasten mehrerer Objekte | [2001/27] | English: | Apparatus for the optical scanning of several objects | [2001/31] | French: | Dispositif pour le balayage optique de plusieurs objets | [2001/31] |
Former [2001/27] | Device for optical scanning of multiple objects | ||
Former [2001/27] | Appareil à balayage optique pour de multiple objects | Examination procedure | 12.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 21.02.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, IT, NL, SE | 15.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.08.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.03.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.02.2005 | [2006/31] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3848962 (NELSON J) [Y] 8,9 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 7 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]US5532874 (STEIN ALFRED [CA]) [X] 1-7,10,11,13-15 * column 1, line 53 - line 61 * * column 5, line 16 - line 61 * * figures 2-4 * [Y] 8,9,12; | [Y]WO9935527 (WALLAC OY [FI], et al) [Y] 12* abstract * |