Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
08.07.2003 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.01.2003 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
19.10.2001 | Change - representative | published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] |
30.03.2001 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] |