EP1100070 - Method for influencing noise in informationsignals having vibrational form, attenuattion- or audiodevice for application of the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rogalski, Werner, Dr. Rosengarten 15 64665 Alsbach-Hähnlein / DE | For all designated states Rogalski, Astrid geb. Paetsch, Rosengarten 15 64665 Alsbach-Hähnlein / DE | [2001/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Köllner, Malte Köllner & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Vogelweidstraße 8 60596 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Köllner, Malte, Dr. Köllner & Kewitz Patentanwälte Rundeturmstrasse 12 64283 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2001/20] | Dallhammer, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Rechtsanwälte Dallhammer & Kellermann Wormser Str. 5 - 7 64625 Bensheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 00124144.7 | 07.11.2000 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | DE19991054502 | 11.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19954502 | [2001/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1100070 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/20] | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/16 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
B32B9/02 (EP);
B32B25/042 (US);
B32B15/06 (US);
B32B15/18 (US);
B32B25/04 (EP);
B32B9/025 (US);
B32B9/041 (US);
B32B9/043 (US);
F16F15/04 (EP);
F16F7/00 (EP);
B32B2307/56 (US);
B32B2311/14 (US);
B32B2311/30 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Beeinflussung von in Schwingungsform vorliegende Informationssignale beeinträchtig ende Störfaktoren, sowie einer Dämpfungseinrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens oder einem Audiogerät zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [2001/20] | English: | Method for influencing noise in informationsignals having vibrational form, attenuattion- or audiodevice for application of the method | [2001/20] | French: | Procédé pour influencer le bruit dans des signaux d'information à forme vibrationelle, dispositif d'atténuation ou audio pour appliquer la méthode | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/01] | 11.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |