EP1076084 - Lumninescent materials for illumination purposes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zachau, Martin Pfarrer-Unsin-Strasse 17 82269 Geltendorf / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Dieter Görresstrasse 1 80798 München / DE | 03 /
Müller, Ulrich Aidenbachstrasse 165 81479 München / DE | [2001/07] | Application number, filing date | 00124154.6 | 05.04.1994 | [2001/07] | Priority number, date | DE19934311197 | 05.04.1993 Original published format: DE 4311197 | [2001/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1076084 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1076084 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1076084 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/81, H01J61/44, H01J61/46 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
H01J61/46 (EP,US);
H01J65/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/025 (EP,US);
C09K11/7774 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/7777 (EP,US);
C09K11/7797 (EP,US);
H01J61/42 (EP,US);
H01J61/44 (EP,US);
H01J61/76 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/07] | C09K11/80 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/07] | Title | German: | Leuchtstoffe fuer Beleuchtungszwecke | [2001/07] | English: | Lumninescent materials for illumination purposes | [2001/07] | French: | Matériaux luminescents pour dispositifs d'illumination | [2001/07] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/07] | 02.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94911105.8 / EP0738311 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6155839 ; | [A]US4423349 (NAKAJIMA SHIGEHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [A]EP0498689 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860729), vol. 010, no. 217, Database accession no. (E - 423), & JP61055839 A 19860320 (OSAMU TADA) [A] 3,4 * abstract * |