EP1099567 - Concentrated dampening water composition for lithographic printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | ||
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Kuniharu c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., No. 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00124248.6 | 10.11.2000 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | JP19990319602 | 10.11.1999 Original published format: JP 31960299 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1099567 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1099567 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41N3/08 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
B41N3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/07] |
Former [2001/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | 07.08.2001 | LT | 07.08.2001 | LV | 07.08.2001 | MK | 07.08.2001 | RO | 07.08.2001 | SI | 07.08.2001 | Title | German: | Feuchtwasserkonzentrat für Litho-Druck | [2001/20] | English: | Concentrated dampening water composition for lithographic printing | [2001/20] | French: | Solution de mouillage concentrée pour l'impression lithographique | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 04.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2006 | BE | 03.05.2006 | CH | 03.05.2006 | CY | 03.05.2006 | FI | 03.05.2006 | FR | 03.05.2006 | IT | 03.05.2006 | LI | 03.05.2006 | NL | 03.05.2006 | TR | 03.05.2006 | DK | 03.08.2006 | SE | 03.08.2006 | GR | 04.08.2006 | ES | 14.08.2006 | PT | 03.10.2006 | IE | 10.11.2006 | LU | 10.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
BE | 03.05.2006 | ||
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
TR | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
IE | 10.11.2006 | ||
LU | 10.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
BE | 03.05.2006 | ||
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
IE | 10.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
BE | 03.05.2006 | ||
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
IE | 10.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
BE | 03.05.2006 | ||
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
BE | 03.05.2006 | ||
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
BE | 03.05.2006 | ||
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
BE | 03.05.2006 | ||
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 03.05.2006 | |
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 03.08.2006 | |
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 03.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1394938 (MONA INDUSTRIES INC) [X] 1-12 * page 5, line 61 - line 76; claim - *; | [A]US4764213 (GVENTER HENRY [US], et al) [A] 1-15* claim - *; | [X]EP0441502 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7,11-15 * page 4, line 32; claim - * * page 4, line 15 *; | [A]US5637444 (MATSUMOTO HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claim - * |