EP1102111 - Liquid crystal display device having improved TFTs and a fabrication method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Displays, Ltd. 3300 Hayano Mobara-shi Chiba / JP | For all designated states Panasonic Liquid Crystal Display Co., Ltd. 1-6, Megahida-cho Shikama-ku, Himeji-shi Hyogo 672-8033 / JP | [2011/48] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyazawa, Toshio, @Hitachi, Ltd., @Int. Prop. Gp. 12th floor, Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Mimura, Akio, @Hitachi, Ltd., @Int. Prop. Gp. 12th floor, Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2012/21] |
Former [2001/21] | 01 /
Miyazawa, Toshio, Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Prop. Gp. New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
Mimura, Akio, Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Prop. Gp. New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/21] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00124340.1 | 17.11.2000 | [2001/21] | Priority number, date | JP19990329725 | 19.11.1999 Original published format: JP 32972599 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1102111 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1102111 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | [2003/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1102111 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1368, H01L29/786, H01L21/336 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
H01L29/66757 (EP,US);
G02F1/136 (KR);
G02F1/1368 (EP,US);
H01L29/78609 (EP,US);
H01L29/78636 (EP,US);
H01L29/78675 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/21] | G02F1/1368, H01L29/786 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/26] |
Former [2001/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung mit verbesserten TFTs und deren Herstellungsverfahren | [2001/21] | English: | Liquid crystal display device having improved TFTs and a fabrication method thereof | [2001/21] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide avec des TFTs améliorés et son procédé de fabrication | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 11.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 30.05.2012 | [2013/08] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH10200120 ; | [DY]JPH1140501 ; | [Y]JPH11121765 ; | [DY]US5648276 (HARA MASAKI [JP], et al) [DY] 7-18 * column 11, line 7 - line 45; figure 13 *; | [X]US5849612 (TAKAHASHI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 58 * * column 6, line 9 - line 26 * * column 7, line 19 - line 25 * * column 13, line 41 - column 14, line 19 * * column 12, line 3 - line 16; figures 1,13,14 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10200120 A 19980731 (SHARP CORP) [X] 1-7 * abstract * [Y] 7-18 | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11040501 A 19990212 (FUJITSU LTD) [DY] 7-18 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11121765 A 19990430 (SONY CORP) [Y] 7-18 * abstract * | Examination | US5970369 | by applicant | JPH0799321 | JPH10200120 |