Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000509962 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP94115505 | 30.09.1994 | EP9503663 | 18.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0783586 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2001 | B1 | EP0783586 | 16.07.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP94115505 | 30.09.1994 | EP95933386 | 18.09.1995 | EP9503663 | 18.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3607695 | Global Dossier | 26.04.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | EP94115505 | 30.09.1994 | EP9503663 | 18.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1091000 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP94115505 | 30.09.1994 | EP00124417 | 18.09.1995 | EP95933386 | 18.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE210727T | 15.12.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP94115505 | 30.09.1994 | EP9503663 | 18.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2201302 | 11.04.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP94115505 | 30.09.1994 | EP9503663 | 18.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69524618T | 14.08.2002 | T2 | DE69524618D1 | 24.01.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP94115505 | 30.09.1994 | EP9503663 | 18.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI971272 | 26.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | EP94115505 | 30.09.1994 | EP9503663 | 18.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ293600 | 28.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | EP94115505 | 30.09.1994 | EP9503663 | 18.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6524588 | 25.02.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP94115505 | 30.09.1994 | EP9503663 | 18.09.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9610641 | Global Dossier | 11.04.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP94115505 | 30.09.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0704533 | Global Dossier | 03.04.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP94115505 | 30.09.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2165434T | 16.03.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP94115505 | 30.09.1994 | Type | Earlier application | EP0783586 |