EP1091000 - An attenuated vaccination and gene-transfer virus, a method to make the virus and a pharmaceutical composition comprising the virus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hobom, Gerd, Prof. Dr. Dr. Arndtstrasse 14 35392 Giessen / DE | [2001/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hobom, Gerd, Prof.Dr.Dr. Arndtstrasse 14 35392 Giessen / DE | 02 /
Neumann, Gabriele Hermann-Löns-Strasse 7 63447 Maintal / DE | 03 /
Menke, Annette Ockershäuser Alle 7 35037 Marburg / DE | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2001/15] | Helbing, Jörg, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 00124417.7 | 18.09.1995 | [2001/15] | Priority number, date | EP19940115505 | 30.09.1994 Original published format: EP 94115505 | [2001/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1091000 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/86, C12N7/00, C12N15/62, A61K39/145, A61K35/76 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5256 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16143 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16161 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Title | German: | Abgeschwächtes Impf- und gentransfervirus, Verfahren zur dessen Herstellung und Arzneimittel die es enthalten | [2001/15] | English: | An attenuated vaccination and gene-transfer virus, a method to make the virus and a pharmaceutical composition comprising the virus | [2001/15] | French: | Virus atténué pour la vaccination et le transfert de gènes, méthode pour sa fabrication et compositions pharmaceutiques le contenant | [2001/15] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 01.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/42] | 19.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/42] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95933386.5 / EP0783586 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9639179 (AVIRON INC [US]) [E] 1-4* example 2 *; | [XY] - PICCONE, M. ET AL., "MUTATIONAL ANALYSIS OF THE INFLUENZA VIRUS VRNA PROMOTER.", VIRUS RES 28 (2). 1993. 99-112, XP000619019 [X] 1-5 * page 101, 'Construction of plasmids' * * figures 3,5 * [Y] 1-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1702(93)90129-B | [DY] - ZOBEL A ET AL, "RNA polymerase I catalysed transcription of insert viral cDNA", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 21, no. 16, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 3607 - 3614, XP002110227 [DY] 1-4 * the whole document * | [Y] - LI, S. ET AL., "Chimeric influenza virus induces neutralizing antibodies and cytotoxic T cells against human immunodeficiency virus type 1", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, vol. 67, no. 11, pages 6659 - 6666, XP000619016 [Y] 5-8 * the whole document * | [A] - LUYTJES, W. ET AL., "Amplification, expression, and packaging of a foreign gene by influenza virus", CELL, (19891222), vol. 59, no. 6, pages 1107 - 1113, XP000083570 [A] 5-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(89)90766-6 | [DA] - NEUMANN G ET AL, "RNA POLYMERASE I-MEDIATED EXPRESSION OF INFLUENZA VIRAL RNA MOLECULES", VIROLOGY, (1994), vol. 202, no. 1, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 477 - 479, XP000952667 [DA] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1994.1365 | [DA] - FODOR, E. ET AL., "The influenza virus panhandle is involved in the initiation of transcription", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, vol. 68, no. 6, pages 4092 - 4096, XP000608116 | [DA] - LI, X. ET AL., "MUTATIONAL ANALYSIS OF THE PROMOTER REQUIRED FOR INFLUENZA VIRUS VIRION RNA SYNTHESIS.", J VIROL 66 (7). 1992. 4331-4338, XP000619017 | [PX] - NEUMANN, G. ET AL., "Mutational analysis of influenza virus promoter elements in vivo.", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY 76 (7). 1709-1717, (1995), XP002140118 [PX] 1-5 * the whole document * |