blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1205293

EP1205293 - Methods of measuring the thickness of multi-layer films [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/20]Method of measuring the thickness of multi-layer films
[2006/12]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 12.12.2007  [2007/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Plast-Control Gerätebau GmbH
Walter-Freitag-Strasse 15
42899 Remscheid / DE
[2006/28]
Former [2002/20]For all designated states
Plast-Control Gerätebau GmbH
Walter-Freitag-Strasse 15
42899 Remscheid / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Müller, Frank
Jakob-Kaiser-Weg 94
42111 Wuppertal / DE
02 / Sappelt, Norbert
Heidterstr. 78
42369 Wuppertal / DE
03 / Konermann, Stefan
Wülfingstr. 7
42897 Remscheid / DE
 [2002/20]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51
33617 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/20]TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR
Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51
33617 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date00124602.410.11.2000
[2002/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1205293
Date:15.05.2002
Language:DE
[2002/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1205293
Date:12.07.2006
Language:DE
[2006/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.2001
ClassificationIPC:B29C47/92
[2002/20]
CPC:
B29C48/335 (EP,US); B29C48/09 (EP,US); B29C48/10 (EP,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US); B29C48/92 (EP,US); B29C2948/92152 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92209 (EP,US); B29C2948/92428 (EP,US); B29C2948/92438 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92647 (EP,US); B29C48/0018 (EP,US); B29C48/0019 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/06]
Former [2002/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Dickenmessung an Mehrschichtfolien[2002/20]
English:Methods of measuring the thickness of multi-layer films[2006/12]
French:Procédés pour mesurer l'épaisseur de films multicouches[2006/12]
Former [2002/20]Method of measuring the thickness of multi-layer films
Former [2002/20]Procédé pour mesurer l'épaisseur de films multicouches
Examination procedure13.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/03]
16.11.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.04.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
16.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2006Fee for grant paid
07.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
17.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.01.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/50]
Former [2007/35]IT12.07.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]US3635620  (BROWN CHARLES A) [A] 1,3,9 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 22 * * column 2, line 58 - column 5, line 20 * * column 6, line 28 - line 35; figure - *;
 [A]GB2038483  (WINZEN INT) [A] 1,4,5* figure -; claim 1 *;
 [X]US4514812  (MILLER PETER S [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column 1, line 16 - line 47 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 5 * * column 4, line 38 - line 60 * * column 6, line 37 - column 8, line 9; figure - *;
 [A]US5676893  (CREE ROBERT E [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * column 11, paragraph 4; figures 1,7 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.