EP1099598 - Panel for climate and dirty air [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steen, Manfred In der Flage 9 27211 Bassum / DE | [2001/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00124615.6 | 10.11.2000 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | DE1999219882U | 11.11.1999 Original published format: DE 29919882 U | [2001/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1099598 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1099598 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60P3/20, B60P7/14 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
B60P3/205 (EP);
B62D33/042 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/20] | B60P3/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/20] | Title | German: | Platte für Klima- und Schmutz | [2001/20] | English: | Panel for climate and dirty air | [2001/20] | French: | Panneau pour la climatisation et l'air vicié | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 20.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/23] | 09.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4049311 (DIETRICH ALFRED T, et al) [Y] 11,13 * abstract *; | [Y]US4080906 (BROWN JAMES W) [Y] 1-6,10-13 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 8; figure 1 * * abstract *; | [Y]EP0252707 (DOVER ROLLER SHUTTERS LTD [GB]) [Y] 10-13 * abstract *; | [A]DE3805525 (KAROSSERIEWERK HEINRICH MEYER [DE]) [A] 1,3,10* abstract *; | [A]US5010943 (BOYER GREGORY J [US]) [A] 1,3,10,11 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE9417892U (BRANDT KUEHLFAHRZEUGBAU [DE]) [Y] 1-6,10,12,13 * figure 1; claim - * |