EP1103766 - Method and device for flame monitoring with gas burners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL B.V. Laarderhoogtweg 18-20 1101 EA Amsterdam Z.O. / NL | [2001/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bosscher, Eric A. van Kuyckweg 24 7957 DH De Wijk / NL | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/22] | Sturm, Christoph Honeywell Holding AG, IP Europe Law Dept., Kaiserleistrasse 39 63067 Offenbach am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 00124793.1 | 14.11.2000 | [2001/22] | Priority number, date | DE1999156395 | 24.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19956395 | [2001/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1103766 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1103766 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/24, F23N5/10 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
F23N5/102 (EP);
F23N5/242 (EP);
F23N2225/19 (EP);
F23N2227/22 (EP);
F23N2229/14 (EP);
F23N2229/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/20] |
Former [2001/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Flammenüberwachung bei Gasbrennern sowie entsprechende Vorrichtung | [2001/22] | English: | Method and device for flame monitoring with gas burners | [2001/22] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de surveillance de flamme avec des brûleurs à gaz | [2001/22] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/52] | 16.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.04.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.04.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS63156923 ; | [X]JPS63101620 ; | [X]DE1551961 (HONEYWELL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 29; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4726514 (ADAM WILLIBALD [DE]) [A] 1,5-7* column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 16; figure - *; | [PX]DE19831451 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PX] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881108), vol. 012, no. 419, Database accession no. (M - 760), & JP63156923 A 19880630 (YAMATAKE HONEYWELL CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880914), vol. 012, no. 343, Database accession no. (M - 741), & JP63101620 A 19880506 (HITACHI HEATING APPLIANCE CO LTD) [X] 1,4-6 * abstract * |