EP1102035 - Method for transmitting position information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Linder Höhe 51147 Köln / DE | [2006/24] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. 53175 Bonn / DE | ||
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. 53175 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Angermann, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Rottenbucherstrasse 19a 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | 02 /
Steingass, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. Am Gemeindeholz 2a 82205 Gilching / DE | 03 /
Robertson, Patrick, Dr. Klosterweg 12 82541 Ammerland / DE | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | von Kirschbaum, Albrecht Patentanwalt Postfach 1520 82102 Germering / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | von Kirschbaum, Albrecht, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Postfach 15 20 82102 Germering / DE | Application number, filing date | 00124899.6 | 15.11.2000 | [2001/21] | Priority number, date | DE1999155181 | 16.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19955181 | [2001/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1102035 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1102035 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1102035 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/20 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
G01C21/26 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/21] | G01C21/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/21] | Title | German: | Positionsinformationsübermittlungsverfahren | [2001/21] | English: | Method for transmitting position information | [2001/21] | French: | Méthode pour transmission d'information de position | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 18.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.12.2005 | FI | 21.12.2005 | IE | 21.12.2005 | IT | 21.12.2005 | NL | 21.12.2005 | TR | 21.12.2005 | DK | 21.03.2006 | GR | 21.03.2006 | SE | 21.03.2006 | ES | 01.04.2006 | PT | 22.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 21.12.2005 | |
IE | 21.12.2005 | ||
IT | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
TR | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 21.12.2005 | |
IE | 21.12.2005 | ||
IT | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 21.12.2005 | |
IE | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 21.12.2005 | |
IE | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 21.12.2005 | |
IE | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 21.12.2005 | |
IE | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 21.12.2005 | |
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 21.12.2005 | |
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 21.12.2005 | |
SE | 21.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 21.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19824587 (HUBER MARKUS [DE]) [X] 11,12 * column 1, line 9 - line 11 * * column 1, line 34 - line 58 * [A] 1; | [A]EP0932132 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* abstract * |