EP1118812 - Lining element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kautex Textron GmbH & Co. KG Kautexstrasse 52 53229 Bonn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states Kautex Textron GmbH & Co. KG. Kautexstrasse 52 53229 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moitzheim, Jürgen Dachsweg 15 53639 Königswinter / DE | 02 /
Bantel, Jörg Leyenhaus 21 51491 Overath / DE | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Kierdorf, Theodor Lippert, Stachow & Partner Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | Kierdorf, Theodor, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 00124970.5 | 16.11.2000 | [2001/30] | Priority number, date | DE2000101932 | 19.01.2000 Original published format: DE 10001932 | [2001/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1118812 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1118812 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/033, B60R13/08 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
F01N13/14 (EP,US);
B29C49/20 (EP,US);
B60R13/0838 (EP,US);
B60R13/0861 (EP,US);
B29C2049/2008 (EP,US);
B29C2049/2013 (EP,US);
B29C2791/001 (EP,US);
B29C49/04 (EP,US);
B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29K2105/04 (EP,US);
B29K2105/048 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0002 (EP,US);
B29L2031/3005 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/15] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verkleidungselement | [2001/30] | English: | Lining element | [2001/30] | French: | Elément de revêtement | [2001/30] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/42] | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.02.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.02.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2750439 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [Y] 6 * figures 4,5 ** page 5, paragraph 6 - page 6, paragraph 3 *; | [Y]US4430286 (FRANZ EDWARD W [US]) [Y] 3 * column 12, lines 3-17; figure 7 *; | [XA]DE8413883U (FA HEINRICH HÄUSSLING) [X] 1,4 * figures 1,2; claims 1,5 * [A] 7,10; | [XY]DE19627106 (HP CHEMIE PELZER RES & DEV [IE]) [X] 1,4,5,9,11 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, lines 3-6,10-14 * * column 2, lines 17-28 * * column 3, lines 13-23 * * column 4, lines 9-31 * [Y] 10; | [Y]US5744763 (IWASA TADANOBU [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * column 13, lines 9-11 *; | [XY]EP0891892 (KAUTEX TEXTRON GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,4,8,11 * figures 1-3; claims 1,8 * * column 3, lines 10-14 * * column 5, lines 19-22 * [Y] 2,3,6,10 | by applicant | DE2515127 | DE19730922 | DE19848677 | DE19848679 |