EP1102387 - DC power supply apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANKEN ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 3-6-3, Kitano Niiza-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states SANKEN ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 3-6-3, Kitano Niiza-shi Saitama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Usui, Hiroshi c/o Sanken Electric Co., Ltd., 3-6-3, Kitano Niiza-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00125023.2 | 16.11.2000 | [2001/21] | Priority number, date | JP19990329944 | 19.11.1999 Original published format: JP 32994499 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1102387 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1102387 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/00, H02M3/335 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
H02M1/4225 (EP,US);
H02M1/0032 (EP);
H02M1/007 (EP);
Y02B70/10 (EP);
Y02P80/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/21] | H02M3/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/40] |
Former [2001/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Gleichstromleistungsversorgung | [2001/21] | English: | DC power supply apparatus | [2001/21] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation de courant continu de puissance | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/21] | 09.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.08.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.08.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5170333 (NIWAYAMA MASAKI [JP]) [Y] 5 * column 4, line 5 - line 24 * * column 6, line 1 - line 17 * * figures 1,4 *; | [XAY]US5903138 (HWANG JEFFREY H [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 19 - line 24 * * column 4, line 46 - line 50 * * column 4, line 61 - line 65 * * column 5, line 11 - line 22 * * column 7, line 46 - line 53 * * column 8, line 10 - line 12 * * column 9, line 53 - line 60 * * column 11, line 62 - line 67 * * figure 7 * [A] 4,6 [Y] 5; | [XA]WO9956505 (MAGNETEK INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 11 * * figure 3 * [A] 4,6; | [E]US6232964 (LEE JOO-HYOUNG [KR]) [E] 1 * column 2, line 44 - line 53 ** figure 1 * |