EP1102301 - Ferrite core in deflection yoke for braun tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-ku Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Seok Moon Hanbit Town 107-1106, Tolyang2-dong Kumi-shi, Kyongsangbuk-do / KR | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Geyer, Fehners & Partner Patentanwälte Perhamerstrasse 31 80637 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/21] | Fehners, Klaus Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing., Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00125158.6 | 17.11.2000 | [2001/21] | Priority number, date | KR19990051421 | 19.11.1999 Original published format: KR 9951421 | KR20000053490 | 08.09.2000 Original published format: KR 2000053490 | [2003/05] |
Former [2001/21] | KR19990051421 | 19.11.1999 | |
KR20000053490 | 08.09.2000 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1102301 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/76, H01J29/70, H01J3/10 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
H01J29/76 (EP,US);
H01J2229/7031 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/08] |
Former [2001/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Eisenkern in Ablenkjoch für Braun-Röhre | [2001/21] | English: | Ferrite core in deflection yoke for braun tube | [2001/21] | French: | Noyau de ferrite dans un collier de deviation pour le tube de BRAUN | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 24.11.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 10.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/46] | 29.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.01.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.01.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.01.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.01.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.01.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.01.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.01.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.01.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.01.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.01.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.01.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.01.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.01.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.01.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.01.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.01.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0238056 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-3,12 * figures 2-6; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0254338 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1,2,12* claim 1 * |