EP1103587 - Packaging adhesive tapes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states tesa AG Quickbornstrasse 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | [2004/37] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Tesa AG Quickbornstrasse 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spies, Manfred, Dr. Unter der Lieth 9a 24576 Bad Bramstedt / DE | [2001/22] | Application number, filing date | 00125180.0 | 18.11.2000 | [2001/22] | Priority number, date | DE1999157451 | 29.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19957451 | [2001/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1103587 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1103587 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | [2001/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1103587 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02, C09J109/00 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
C09J7/383 (EP);
C09J2409/00 (EP);
C09J2433/00 (EP);
Y02P20/582 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/22] | C09J7/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/36] |
Former [2001/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verpackungsklebebänder | [2001/22] | English: | Packaging adhesive tapes | [2001/22] | French: | Rubans adhésifs pour emballage | [2001/22] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 17.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Request for further processing for: | 12.11.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.11.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH0345676 ; | [A]US4400428 (ROSENTHAL HEINRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1,2* column 2, line 41 - line 49 *; | [Y]GB2137212 (STERLING ADHESIVE MATERIALS LI) [Y] 1-11 * page 1, line 26 - line 36 * * claims 1,2,15,16 *; | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 15, Database accession no. 1991-104953, XP002161591 & JPH0345676 A 19910227 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM INC) [X] 1-11 * abstract * [Y] 1-11 |