Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3114156B | Global Dossier | 04.12.2000 | B2 | JPH0871511 | 19.03.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12958895 | 28.04.1995 | JP16876794 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1080797 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2005 | A3 | EP1080797 | 07.03.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP95107411 | 15.05.1995 | JP16876794 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5846335 | 08.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US43475495 | 04.05.1995 | US84490397 | 22.04.1997 | JP16876794 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0692318 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2001 | B1 | EP0692318 | 17.01.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP16876794 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69522617T | 04.07.2002 | T2 | DE69522617D1 | 18.10.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP16876794 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100373062B | 09.05.2003 | B1 | KR960000319 | 25.01.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP16876794 | 28.06.1994 | Type | Earlier application | EP0692318 |