EP1080797 - Method and apparatus for cleaning workpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maekawa, Toshiro 2603-1-507, Kamitsuruma Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Ono, Koji 9-2, Inari 1-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Okada, Motoaki 21-4, Kamiigusa 1-chome Suginami-ku, Zokyo / JP | 04 /
Takahashi, Tamami 27-8, Minamicho 5-chome Tanashi-shi, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Mishima, Shiro 308 Chelsea Cay Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | 06 /
Kodera, Masako 21-9, Kitaterao 3-chome, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 07 /
Shigeta, Atsushi 8-10, Higashikaigan 2-chome, Tsujido Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 08 /
Aoki, Riichiro 15-20, Adachi 4-chome Adachi-ku, Tokyo / JP | 09 /
Kouno, Gisuke 68-10, Miyakawauchi-Hairando Oita-shi, Oita-ken / JP | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/10] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00125349.1 | 15.05.1995 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | JP19940168767 | 28.06.1994 Original published format: JP 16876794 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1080797 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1080797 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B08B1/04, B24B37/04, H01L21/306, H01L21/00, B24D3/32, B08B1/00 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
H01L21/02046 (EP,US);
B08B1/32 (EP,KR,US);
B08B1/50 (US);
B08B1/52 (EP);
B08B11/00 (KR);
B08B3/08 (EP,US);
B24B37/345 (EP,US);
B24D3/32 (EP,US);
H01L21/02052 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/10] | B08B1/04, B24B37/04, H01L21/306, H01L21/00, B24D3/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2001/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Reinigung von Werkstücken | [2001/10] | English: | Method and apparatus for cleaning workpiece | [2001/10] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le nettoyage de pièces | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/40] | 14.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95107411.1 / EP0692318 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 12   M06   Not yet paid | 31.05.2009 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH02109333 ; | [XY]JPH04107824 ; | [Y]EP0390134 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 14,15,19,20 * abstract ** column 3, line 21 - line 33 *; | [Y]US5235995 (BERGMAN ERIC J [US], et al) [Y] 13,18 * abstract * * column 8, line 9 - line 21 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900711), vol. 014, no. 324, Database accession no. (E - 0951), & JP02109333 A 19900423 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD) [X] 1-5,11,12 * abstract * [Y] 13-15,18-20 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920727), vol. 016, no. 347, Database accession no. (E - 1240), & JP04107824 A 19920409 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD; others: 01) [X] 6-10,16,17 * abstract * [Y] 18-20 |