EP1103546 - Process for preparation of pyridine derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hilpert, Hans 12 Fasanenstrasse 4153 Reinach / CH | 02 /
Hoffmann-Emery, Fabienne 71 Muttenzerstrasse 4127 Birsfelden / CH | 03 /
Rimmler, Goesta 33 St. Trudpertstrasse 79189 Bad Krozingen / DE | 04 /
Rogers-Evans, Mark 1 Hauptstrasse 4102 Binningen / CH | 05 /
Stahr, Helmut Werner 48 Dorfstrasse 79539 Lörrach / DE | 06 /
Waldmeier, Pius 10 Bachstrasse 4317 Wegenstetten / CH | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Poppe, Regina, et al F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Poppe, Regina, et al 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basle / CH | Application number, filing date | 00125665.0 | 23.11.2000 | [2001/22] | Priority number, date | EP19990123686 | 29.11.1999 Original published format: EP 99123686 | [2001/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1103546 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1103546 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/75, C07D213/82, A61K31/44, A61K31/455, A61P25/22, A61P25/24 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
C07D213/75 (EP,US);
C07D213/82 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/08] |
Former [2001/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für Pyridinderivate | [2001/22] | English: | Process for preparation of pyridine derivatives | [2001/22] | French: | Procédé de préparation pour les dérivés de pyridine | [2001/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 22.10.2003 | TR | 22.10.2003 | CY | 23.11.2003 | LU | 23.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | GR | 22.01.2004 | SE | 22.01.2004 | PT | 22.03.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2006/51] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
TR | 22.10.2003 | ||
CY | 23.11.2003 | ||
LU | 23.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
CY | 23.11.2003 | ||
LU | 23.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
CY | 23.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
CY | 23.11.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 22.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0235663 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 11 * * page 40; example 46 *; | [PDX]EP1035115 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [PDX] 1-4,9,10 * page 15, scheme 6 *;; examples 43A,46 * * page 11, scheme 1 * * example 23F *; | [A] - W.SCHLECKER, "Synthesis of 4-Arylpyridines and Substituted beta-Carbolines via 1,4-Grignard-Addition to Pyridinecarboxamides", TETRAHEDRON, (1995), vol. 51, no. 35, pages 9531 - 9542, XP002160665 [A] 1 * examples 8,12,14 * * page 9532, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4020(95)00596-Z | Examination | - Fluka Catalogue, page 1099: Product Number 71495: Red-Al |