EP1103736 - Chain cage for rolling members [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rexroth Star GmbH Ernst-Sachs-Strasse 100 97424 Schweinfurt / DE | [2001/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blaurock, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Wielandstrasse 7 97464 Niederwerrn / DE | 02 /
Schlereth, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) An der Klostermauer 12 97705 Frauenroth / DE | 03 /
Stender, Hans-Georg Armin-Knab-Strasse 6 97456 Hambach / DE | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Herzog, Markus, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00125703.9 | 23.11.2000 | [2001/22] | Priority number, date | US19990449227 | 24.11.1999 Original published format: US 449227 | DE1999157110 | 26.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19957110 | [2001/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1103736 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1103736 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/38 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
F16C29/06 (EP);
F16C33/3825 (EP);
F16C33/506 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [2002/08] |
Former [2001/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Wälzkörperkette | [2001/22] | English: | Chain cage for rolling members | [2001/22] | French: | Chaîne d'éléments de roulement | [2001/22] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 22.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.01.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19830578 (THK CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,10,13,15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4211400 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [A] 7,9 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 29; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US5927858 (AGARI NORIMASA [JP]) [A] 8 * column 5, line 50 - column 7, line 35; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2897021 (ZEILMAN ROY H) [A] 12 * column 4, line 1 - line 8; figure 7 *; | [A]US5295749 (TAKAHASHI KATSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US3733110 (DAVIS P) [A] 1 * column 3, line 5 - line 30; figure 6 * |