EP1103272 - Modulation of TGF-beta by proteolytic enzymes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MUCOS Pharma GmbH & Co. Malvenweg 2 82538 Geretsried / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states MUCOS Pharma GmbH & Co. Malvenweg 2 D-82538 Geretsried / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ransberger, Karl Seepromenade 5 82402 Seeshaupt / DE | 02 /
Stauder, Gerhard Primelweg 2 82538 Geretsried / DE | 03 /
Desser, Lucia Volkgasse 6 1130 Wien / AT | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00126088.4 | 29.11.2000 | [2001/22] | Priority number, date | DE1999157318 | 29.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19957318 | [2001/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1103272 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1103272 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/48, A61P17/00, A61P19/00, A61P9/10, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P13/12, A61P39/02, // (A61K38/48, 31:7048) | [2001/22] | CPC: |
A61K38/4826 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/22] | Title | German: | Beeinflussung von TGF-Beta durch proteolytische Enzyme | [2001/22] | English: | Modulation of TGF-beta by proteolytic enzymes | [2001/22] | French: | Modulation du TGF-beta par des enzymes protéolytiques | [2001/22] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 23.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/39] | 09.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4302060 (MUCOS PHARMA GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-8 * column 1; claims 1-10 *; | [X]WO9600082 (CORTECS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,11 * claims 1,14-18 *; | [X]WO9724138 (CORTECS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,11 * claims 1,13-17 *; | [X]DE19726244 (MUCOS PHARMA GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-8,11 * claims 1-7 *; | [X]EP0943337 (MUCOS PHARMA GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-8 * claims 1-7 *; | [X] - GACIONG Z ET AL, "Protease therapy alleviates allograft arteriosclerosis in rats", TRANSPLANTATION PROCEEDINGS, ORLANDO, FL, US, (19961201), vol. 28, no. 6, ISSN 0041-1345, pages 3439 - 3440, XP002082012 [X] 1-4,6-8,11 * abstract * * page 3440, column 1, paragraph 2 * | [X] - STAUDER ET AL, "Strahlentherapeutische Nebenwirkungen bei Abdominalkrebspatienten und deren Reduktion durch hydrolytische Enzympräparate", DTSCH.ZSCHR.ONKOL., (1991), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 7 - 16, XP001121080 [X] 1-4,8,10 * abstract * * Diskussion * | [X] - SCHEDLER ET AL, "Adjuvant therapy with hydrolytic enzymes in oncology a hopeful effort to avoid bleomycin induced pneumotoxicity", J. CANCER RESEARCH AND CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (1990), vol. 116, no. Supp.1, page 697, XP009002920 [X] 1,8,9 * abstract * | [X] - PACZEK ET AL, "Beneficial effect of proteases on TGF-beta production in glomeruli from streptozotocin induced diabetes mellitus in rats", INT.J.TISS.REAC., (1997), vol. XIX, no. (1/2), pages 93 - 94, XP009002930 [X] 1-8,12-15 * abstract * | [XY] - DESSER L ET AL, "Polyenzyme preparations interrupt the autocrine loop of TGF-beta production in melanoma cells by conversing alpha2Macroglobulin (a2M) into the fast-form which binds TGF-beta irreversible", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (199909), vol. 35, ISSN 0959-8049, page S375, XP004385434 [X] 1-8,14,15 * abstract * [Y] 1-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-8049(99)81940-6 | [Y] - BIENKOWSKI, GOTKIN, "Control of collagen Deposition in Mammalian Lung", PROC.SOC.EXP.BIOL.MED., (1995), vol. 209, pages 118 - 142, XP009002944 [Y] 1-8 * page 125, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 126, column 1, paragraph 1 * * abstract * |