EP1107311 - Semiconductor die package including cup-shaped leadframe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SILICONIX Incorporated 2201 Laurelwood Road, M/S 12 Santa Clara, California 95054-1595 / US | [2011/19] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states SILICONIX INCORPORATED 2201 Laurelwood Road Santa Clara, California 95054-1595 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Mike 13095 Mt. Bello Road Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
Owyang, King 66 Encina Avenue Atherton, CA 94026 / US | 03 /
Ho, Yueh-Se 735 Iris Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 04 /
Kasem, Y. Mohammed 2321 Regina Court Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 05 /
Luo, Lixiong 1097 Huntingdon Drive San Jose, CA 95129 / US | 06 /
Chu, Wei-Bing 305 An Shen Road, Room 462 Shangai / SI | [2002/03] |
Former [2001/24] | 01 /
Chang, Mike 13095 Mt. Bello Road Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | ||
02 /
Owyang, King 66 Encina Avenue Atherton, CA 94026 / US | |||
03 /
Ho, Yueh-Se 735 Iris Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | |||
04 /
Kasem, Y. Mohammed 2321 Regina Court Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | |||
05 /
Luo, Lixiong 1097 Huntingdon Drive San Jose, CA 95129 / US | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/35] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/24] | Kolb, Georg DaimlerChrysler AG, Postfach 35 35 74025 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 00126153.6 | 30.11.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | US19990468249 | 10.12.1999 Original published format: US 468249 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1107311 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1107311 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1107311 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/495 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
H01L23/49562 (EP,US);
H01L24/34 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8485 (EP,US);
H01L23/3107 (EP,US);
H01L23/544 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01039 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13091 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/37099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/14, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2004/48] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Halbleiterpackung mit becherförmigem Leiterrahmen | [2001/24] | English: | Semiconductor die package including cup-shaped leadframe | [2001/24] | French: | Empaquetage de semi-conducteur ayant un cadre de connexion en forme de gobelet | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 03.09.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.12.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FR, GB, IT, NL | 02.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.09.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Request for further processing for: | 14.11.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 14.11.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.11.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.10.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]JP2000277542 ; | [XY]US3972062 (HOPP GENE P) [X] 1,2,7,8 * the whole document * [Y] 6; | [Y]EP0810660 (MOTOROLA SEMICONDUCTEURS [FR]) [Y] 6 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP0978871 (HARRIS CORP [US]) [PX] 1-3,7,8 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0008684 (FAIRCHILD SEMICONDUCTOR [US]) [PX] 1,2,7,8* the whole document * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000277542 A 20001006 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [PX] 1,2,7,8 * the whole document * |