EP1142526 - Wringer mop with removable mop head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE LIBMAN COMPANY 220 North Sheldon Arcola Illinois / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states THE LIBMAN COMPANY 220 North Sheldon Arcola Illinois / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Libman, Robert J. 909 West University Champaign, Illinois 61821 / US | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Niederkofler, Oswald, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Niederkofler, Oswald A. Dipl.-Phys., et al Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00126195.7 | 30.11.2000 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | US20000516830 | 06.03.2000 Original published format: US 516830 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1142526 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/144, A47L13/12 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
A47L13/12 (EP,US);
A47L13/144 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/27] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Auswringbarer Mop mit austauschbarem Mopkopf | [2001/41] | English: | Wringer mop with removable mop head | [2001/41] | French: | Balai essorable à tête amovible | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 23.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2003 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 24.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2003 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 25.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/31] | 16.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3727259 (WILSON F) [X] 1-3,9-12,17 * abstract * * column 2, line 35 - line 58 * * column 4, line 1 - line 52 * * figure - * [Y] 13-16,19; | [X]US5097561 (TORRES BONIFACIO [US]) [X] 1,2,9-12 * abstract * * column 3, line 57 - line 63 * * column 4, line 1 - line 3 * * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 17 * * column 5, line 51 - line 68 * * column 6, line 1 - line 55 * * figure - *; | [X]DE1293983 (OHG F LLI RE DI RE ENRICO E RE) [X] 1,8-12 * claim - * * figure - *; | [YA]FR2767465 (FENG HSU HSIU [TW]) [Y] 13-15 * abstract * * figure - * [A] 16; | [Y]CH198085 (OBRIST ALBERT [CH]) [Y] 16 * figure - *; | [YX]US4908901 (TORRES BONIFACIO [US]) [Y] 19,22,23 * abstract * * figure - * [X] 21; | [Y]US5371917 (HOAGLAND MARY M [US]) [Y] 22,23 * abstract * * figure - *; | [X]GB985124 (RE ENRICO, et al) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US1509731 (DUNCAN KEIR) [A] 9 * figures 1-3 * |