EP1106130 - Telescopic vacuum cleaner pipe made of three sections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fischer-Rohrtechnik GmbH Gewerbegebiet 7 77855 Achern-Fautenbach / DE | [2001/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cordes, August 3, Unterm Krähenberg 59846 Sundern / DE | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Eichelbaum, Lambert Krüppeleichen 6 45659 Recklinghausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Eichelbaum, Lambert, Dipl.-Ing. Krüppeleichen 6 45659 Recklinghausen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00126251.8 | 01.12.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | DE1999158322 | 03.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19958322 | [2001/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1106130 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1106130 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/24 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
A47L9/244 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/29] |
Former [2002/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | ||
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Dreiteiliges teleskopierbares Staubsauger-Saugrohr | [2001/24] | English: | Telescopic vacuum cleaner pipe made of three sections | [2001/24] | French: | Tuyau d'aspirateur comportant trois éléments télescopiques | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 07.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 11.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 17.07.2002 | GR | 17.07.2002 | IE | 17.07.2002 | TR | 17.07.2002 | DK | 17.10.2002 | PT | 17.10.2002 | LU | 01.12.2002 | BE | 31.12.2002 | CY | 31.12.2002 | ES | 30.01.2003 | [2006/51] |
Former [2004/39] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
IE | 17.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.10.2002 | ||
PT | 17.10.2002 | ||
LU | 01.12.2002 | ||
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
IE | 17.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.10.2002 | ||
PT | 17.10.2002 | ||
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
IE | 17.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.10.2002 | ||
PT | 17.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/45] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
IE | 17.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.10.2002 | ||
PT | 17.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
IE | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | FI | 17.07.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3409578 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [AD]US5692782 (FISCHER HANS [DE]) [AD] 1 * column W * |