EP1111053 - Peptide fragment of the respiratory syncytial virus g protein, immunogenic agent, pharmaceutical composition containing same , and preparation method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/26] | Peptide fragment of the respiratory syncytial virus G protein, immunogenic agent, pharmaceutical composition containing same, and preparation method | ||
[2001/31] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT 45, Place Abel Gance 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2001/51] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT 45, Place Abel Gance 92100 Boulogne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Binz, Hans Haldenweg 1 4533 Riedholz / CH | 02 /
N Guyen Ngoc, Thien 7 Les Petits Hutins, Lathoy 74160 Saint-Julien-en-Genevois / FR | 03 /
Baussant, Thierry 4 rue Alphonse Baudin 01200 Bellegarde / FR | 04 /
Trudel, Michel 88 Val d'Ajol Lorraine, Québec J6Z 3Y3 / CA | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00126606.3 | 06.04.1995 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | FR19940004009 | 06.04.1994 Original published format: FR 9404009 | [2001/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1111053 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1111053 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | [2001/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/45, C12N15/31, C07K14/135, C07K14/26, C07K14/765, A61K39/155, A61K47/48 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
A61K39/155 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K47/646 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C07K14/26 (EP,US);
C07K14/765 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55566 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6037 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6068 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6081 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/26] | C12N15/45 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/26] | Title | German: | Peptidfragmente des g-proteins des respiratorischen syncytialvirus, immunogene verbindung und pharmazeutische zusammensetzung, die es enthaelt, und herstellungsverfahren | [2001/31] | English: | Peptide fragment of the respiratory syncytial virus g protein, immunogenic agent, pharmaceutical composition containing same , and preparation method | [2001/31] | French: | Fragment peptidique de la protéine g du virus respiratoire syncytial, agent immunogène, composition pharmaceutique le contentant et procédé de préparation | [2001/26] |
Former [2001/26] | Peptidfragment des G-proteins des respiratorischen Syncytialvirus, immunogene Verbindung und pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung, die es enthalten, und Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [2001/26] | Peptide fragment of the respiratory syncytial virus G protein, immunogenic agent, pharmaceutical composition containing same, and preparation method | Examination procedure | 21.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 10.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/33] | 30.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/33] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95916721.4 / EP0754231 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 18.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8905823 (UPJOHN CO [US]) [X] 1-6,10,18-21,23 * page 5, line 21 - line 26 * * page 13, line 1 - line 15 * * page 13, line 25 - page 14, line 9; example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0355737 (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9204375 (UPJOHN CO [US]) [A] 1-8,10,11,20-23 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9220805 (PF MEDICAMENT [FR]) [X] 1-16,18-23 * example III; claim - *; | [X]WO9314207 (CONNAUGHT LAB [CA]) [X] 1,2,10,11,18-23 * figures 7,8; examples 1,15-18; claim - *; | [X] - NORRBY, ERLING ET AL, "Site-directed serology with synthetic peptides representing the large glycoprotein G of respiratory syncytial virus", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A. (1987), 84(18), 6572-6 CODEN: PNASA6;ISSN: 0027-8424, XP000990687 [X] 1-9 * see peptide 12; page 6576, column L, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4; figure 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.84.18.6572 | [A] - B. GARCIA-BARRENO ET AL., "Marked Differences in the Antigenic Structure of Human Respiratory Syncytical Virus F and G Glycoproteins", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, vol. 63, no. 2, pages 925 - 932, XP000997415 [A] 1-8 * le Discussion page 931 * | [A] - J.G. LAWRENCE ET AL., "Molecular and evolutionary relationship among enteric bacteria", JOURNAL OF GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 137, no. 8, pages 1911 - 1921, XP000997216 [A] * figure 1 * | Examination | - TRUDEL, M ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1991), vol. 185, pages 749 - 757 |