blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1108422

EP1108422 - Medical product for moisturising and cleansing the nasal mucosa [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2010Change - representativepublished on 21.04.2010  [2010/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Krewel Meuselbach GmbH
Krewelstrasse 2
53783 Eitorf / DE
[2001/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Schierstedt, Dieter, Dr.
Henri-Dunant-Strasse 2
53757 St. Augustin / DE
 [2001/25]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2008/30]Jönsson, Hans-Peter, et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2001/25]Jönsson, Hans-Peter, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte, von Kreisling Selting Werner, Deichmannhaus am Dom
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date00126753.306.12.2000
[2001/25]
Priority number, dateDE199916130718.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19961307
[2001/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1108422
Date:20.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1108422
Date:26.09.2001
[2001/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2001
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/00, A61K9/06
[2001/25]
CPC:
A61K9/0043 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/24]
Former [2001/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Medizinprodukt zur Befeuchtung und Reinigung der Nasenschleimhaut[2001/25]
English:Medical product for moisturising and cleansing the nasal mucosa[2001/25]
French:Produit médical pour l'humidification et le nettoyage de la muqueuse nasale[2001/25]
Examination procedure17.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/13]
05.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
24.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0326915  (SENJU PHARMA CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * claims 2-4 * * page 3, line 50 - line 51 * * page 4, line 2 * * page 4, line 9 - line 10 * * page 4, line 14 - line 19 * * page 4, line 26 - line 35 * * example - *;
 [X]EP0412524  (TOKO YAKUHIN KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,7,8 * claims 1,2,4 * * column 1, line 15 - line 17 * * column 1, line 29 - line 30 * * column 2, line 27 - line 30 * * column 3, line 9 - line 14 *;
 [X]JPH03287535  ;
 [X]JPS61126014  ;
 [X]JPH0253733
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 06, Database accession no. 1992-044323, XP002172525 & JPH03287535 A 19911218 (BYRON BOEKI KK) [X] 1-7 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 30, Database accession no. 1986-193349, XP002172526 & JPS61126014 A 19860613 (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 14, Database accession no. 1990-103162, XP002172527 & JPH0253733 A 19900222 (TEIKOKU HORMONE MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-3,6,7 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.