EP1213343 - Cleaning agent and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Bauchemie GmbH Marke Deitermann Lohstrasse 61 45711 Datteln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Heidelberger Bauchemie GmbH Marke Deitermann, Lohstrasse 61 45711 Datteln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hesselbarth, Frank Dr. Bielefelder Weg 21 45659 Recklinghausen / DE | 02 /
Maleki, Gholamhossein Leveringhäuser Strasse 62 45731 Waltrop / DE | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Nunnenkamp, Jörg, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Nunnenkamp, Jörg, Dr., et al Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien Patentanwälte Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00126809.3 | 07.12.2000 | [2002/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1213343 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/04, C11D3/20 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
C11D3/042 (EP);
C11D1/662 (EP);
C11D1/72 (EP);
C11D3/2075 (EP);
C11D2111/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2003/10] |
Former [2002/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Reinigungsmittel und Verwendung des Reinigungsmittels | [2002/24] | English: | Cleaning agent and use thereof | [2002/24] | French: | Agent de nettoyage et son utilisation | [2002/24] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 13.12.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.04.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.01.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS54118339 ; | [X]JPH0931493 ; | [X]HU60323 ; | [X]JPS624798 ; | [XA]CN1103853 ; | [XA]JPS5920479 ; | [A]JPS5274604 ; | [A]US3793221 (OTRHALEK J, et al) [A] 1-9 * example I *; | [XA]US4199469 (WALZER MICHAEL [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * examples 1,2 * [A] 6; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1979, no. 43, Database accession no. 1979-78019B, XP002167931 & JPS54118339 A 19790913 (IWAO K) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,10 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09031493 A 19970204 (CLEAN CHEM KK;MATSUZAKI HIDEO) [X] 1-7,9 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 41, Database accession no. 1992-334382, XP002167932 & HU60323 A 19920828 (EPITESTUDOMANYI INTEZET) [X] 1-7,9 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 07, Database accession no. 1987-046873, XP002167933 & JPS624798 A 19870110 (SUNPOLE KK) [X] 1-7,9,10 * abstract * | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 27, Database accession no. 1997-290178, XP002167934 & CN1103853 A 19950621 (LI Y) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * [A] 2,6,7,9 | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1984, no. 11, Database accession no. 1984-065226, XP002167935 & JPS5920479 A 19840202 (DAIICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD) [X] 1,3,5,7 * abstract * [A] 2,6 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1977, no. 31, Database accession no. 1977-55036Y, XP002167936 & JPS5274604 A 19770622 (NISHITANI E) [A] 1-5,9,10 * abstract * |