EP1219284 - Aqueous composition with antiplaque activity for soft silicon denture base lining material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DETAX Karl Huber GmbH & Co.KG Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 4 76275 Ettlingen / DE | [2002/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sohr, Volker, Dr. Fliederstrasse 39 76307 Karlsbad / DE | 02 /
Juretzki, Ursula Sophienstrasse 182 76185 Karlsruhe / DE | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 00126872.1 | 07.12.2000 | [2002/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1219284 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/00 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
A61Q11/02 (EP);
A61K8/43 (EP);
A61K8/894 (EP);
A61K8/922 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2003/13] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Wässrige Zusammensetzung mit plaquehemmender Wirkung auf weichbleibenden, auf Silikon basierenden Zahnprothesenunterfütterungen | [2002/27] | English: | Aqueous composition with antiplaque activity for soft silicon denture base lining material | [2002/27] | French: | Composition aqueouse avec activité antiplaque pour matériau de rebase mou du type siliconé | [2002/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/46] | 04.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.02.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.02.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPS61289025 [ ] (PIGEON KK); | [A]WO9633693 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XY] - ARAYA, YOSHIMITSU ET AL, "Cleansers for dentures", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 106:162432 CA, URL: STN, XP002169810 [X] 1-9 * abstract * [Y] 10 | [Y] - Z. HIRSCHEFELD, "New sustaine release dosage form of chlorhexidine for dental use: use for plaque control in partial denture wearers", JOURNAL OF ORAL REHABILITATIN, (1984), vol. 11, page 477-482, XP000993557 [Y] 10 *Zusammenfassung* |