EP1106831 - Control valve in a variable capacity compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | ||
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 2-1, Toyoda-cho, Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Kazuya KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 1, Toyoda-cho 2 chome, Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | 02 /
Kawaguchi, Masahiro KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 1, Toyoda-cho 2 chome, Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | 03 /
Kayukawa, Hiroaki KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 1, Toyoda-cho 2 chome, Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | 04 /
Fukanuma, Tetsuhiko KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 1, Toyoda-cho 2 chome, Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00126876.2 | 07.12.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | JP19990350152 | 09.12.1999 Original published format: JP 35015299 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1106831 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1106831 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F04B27/18 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
F04B27/1804 (EP,US);
F04B2027/1813 (EP,US);
F04B2027/1827 (EP,US);
F04B2027/1854 (EP,US);
F04B2027/1859 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7668 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kontrollventil in einem Verdichter variabler Verdrängung | [2001/24] | English: | Control valve in a variable capacity compressor | [2001/24] | French: | Soupape de régulation d'un compresseur à capacité variable | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 03.03.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.06.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 10.03.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.04.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2633871 (PARSONS JOHN B) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * * figure 1 *; | [X]US2704649 (ELLENBERGER FRANCIS R) [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document * * column 2, line 80 - column 3, line 57 *; | [X]US3012578 (LUDWIG WALTER D) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * * column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 27; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0848164 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US5890876 (SUITOU KEN [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0919720 (FUJIKOKI CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [A]EP0953766 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document * |