EP1106875 - Control system for automatic vehicle transmissions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2006/35] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Yoshiharu, K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Inagawa, Yasushi, K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Kon, Takanori, K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 04 /
Fukuchi, Masamitsu, K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 05 /
Majikina, Shinya, K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Prechtel, Jörg, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/24] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00126974.5 | 08.12.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | JP19990350888 | 09.12.1999 Original published format: JP 35088899 | JP19990350892 | 09.12.1999 Original published format: JP 35089299 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1106875 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1106875 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1106875 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/06, F16H59/14 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
F16H61/061 (EP,US);
F16H2059/147 (EP,US);
F16H59/14 (EP,US);
F16H61/143 (EP,US);
F16H61/684 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/24] | F16H61/06, // F16H59:14, F16H61:21 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/51] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Steuerung für automatische Fahrzeuggetriebe | [2001/24] | English: | Control system for automatic vehicle transmissions | [2001/24] | French: | Système de commande de transmission automatique de véhicule | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 29.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4868753 (MORI YASUSHI [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 30 * * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 8; figure 4 *; | [A]US5967942 (YUASA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0654623 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,2 * page 3, lines 33-50 * * page 4, lines 9-58 * | by applicant | JPH06207660 |