EP1177952 - Luggage restraining structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIA MOTORS CORPORATION 15-21, Yoido-dong Youngdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-706 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states KIA MOTORS CORPORATION 15-21, Yoido-dong Youngdeungpo-gu, Seoul 150-706 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Yong Dae 1-31, 201 Ga-dong,Samrak-yunlip Singye-dong, Yongsan-gu, Seoul 140-090 / KR | [2007/32] |
Former [2002/06] | 01 /
Kim, Yong Dae 1-31,#201 Ga-dong,Samrak-yunlip Singye-dong, Yongsan-gu, Seoul 140-090 / KR | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00127183.2 | 12.12.2000 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | KR20000044632 | 01.08.2000 Original published format: KR 2000044632 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1177952 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1177952 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/02 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
B60R21/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/27] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gepäckrückhaltestruktur | [2002/06] | English: | Luggage restraining structure | [2002/06] | French: | Structure de retenue pour bagages | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/01] | 04.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.06.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.06.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2771367 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figure - *; | [X]DE19744664 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 23 *; | [X]DE19905295 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO [JP]) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * * column 4, lines 1-13 * * column 6, line 35 - column 7, line 9 * * figures 4,7A-C,9B *; | [X]JP2000142484 ; | [X]US5167479 (BOTT JOHN A [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure - *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, & JP2000142484 A 20000523 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure - * | [PX] - KHUONG D, LES NOUVELLES EXIGENCES DE RENAULT EN CARROSSERIE INTERIEURE AUTOMOBILE, INGENIEURS DE L'AUTOMOBILE, RAIP. BOULOGNE, FR, NR. 741, PAGE(S) 80-83, ISSN 0020-1200, XP000987549 [PX] 1 * page 80, column 3 * * figures 3,4 * |