EP1114919 - Muffler device for exhaust systems of automotive vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amft, Karl Heinrich Lötzener Strasse 4 45966 Gladbeck / DE | [2001/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Lelgemann, Karl-Heinz, et al Patentanwälte Spalthoff und Lelgemann Huyssenallee 70/72 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | Lelgemann, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Spalthoff und Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20 45074 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2001/28] | Spalthoff, Adolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. A. Spalthoff, Dipl.-Ing. K. Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20 45074 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00127423.2 | 14.12.2000 | [2001/28] | Priority number, date | DE2000200155U | 06.01.2000 Original published format: DE 20000155 U | [2001/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1114919 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1114919 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F01N7/18, C08G69/44, C08G63/60 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
F01N13/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/14] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schalldämpfer für Auspuffanlagen von Kraftfahrzeugen | [2001/28] | English: | Muffler device for exhaust systems of automotive vehicles | [2001/28] | French: | Silencieux pour systèmes d'échappement des véhicules automobiles | [2001/28] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 02.04.2003 | TR | 02.04.2003 | CY | 14.12.2003 | FI | 14.12.2003 | IE | 15.12.2003 | BE | 31.12.2003 | MC | 31.12.2003 | DK | 02.01.2004 | [2009/42] |
Former [2008/23] | GR | 02.04.2003 | |
CY | 14.12.2003 | ||
FI | 14.12.2003 | ||
IE | 15.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
DK | 02.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | CY | 14.12.2003 | |
FI | 14.12.2003 | ||
IE | 15.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
DK | 02.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | CY | 14.12.2003 | |
FI | 14.12.2003 | ||
IE | 15.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CY | 14.12.2003 | |
FI | 14.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/01] | CY | 14.12.2003 | |
FI | 14.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/40] | GB | 02.04.2003 | |
CY | 14.12.2003 | ||
FI | 14.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | GB | 02.04.2003 | |
CY | 14.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 02.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1939197 (STIER EUGEN) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]GB2143275 (PRODUCTION ENG RES) [A] 1 * column 2, line 90 - column 2, line 112; claims 1,2 *; | [A]WO8904915 (YAMATO KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 21 - page 5, line 8 *; | [X]EP0394451 (NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * page 1, paragraph 1; claims 1-4 * * page 8 *; | [A]US5052513 (YOSHIKAWA HIDEO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 54 - page 1, line 56 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 9; claim 7 *; | [A]US5468923 (KLEYN HENDRIK [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0701083 (EX CELL O CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, paragraph 1 ** column 8, line 44 - column 8, line 59 * |