EP1109225 - Electroluminescence display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/25] | EL display device | ||
[2015/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [2015/49] |
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states SEL SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishi, Takeshi c/oSemiconductor Energy Lab., Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | 02 /
Ishimara, Noriko c/oSemiconductor Energy Lab., Co., Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [2015/49] |
Former [2001/25] | 01 /
Nishi, Takeshi c/oSemiconductor Energy Lab., Co., Ltd., 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | ||
02 /
Ishimara, Noriko c/oSemiconductor Energy Lab., Co., Ltd., 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/49] |
Former [2001/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00127537.9 | 15.12.2000 | [2001/25] | Priority number, date | JP19990356732 | 15.12.1999 Original published format: JP 35673299 | [2001/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1109225 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1109225 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | [2005/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1109225 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32, H01L51/52 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
H10K59/12 (EP,US);
H05B33/26 (KR);
H10K50/814 (US);
H10K50/86 (US);
H10K50/865 (US);
H10K50/87 (US);
H10K2102/3026 (EP,US);
H10K59/123 (EP,KR,US);
H10K59/80516 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2005/41] | H01L27/00, H01L51/20 | ||
Former IPC [2001/25] | H01L27/15 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2015/49] |
Former [2006/25] | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2001/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Elektrolumineszenzanzeige | [2001/25] | English: | Electroluminescence display device | [2015/33] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage electroluminescent | [2001/25] |
Former [2001/25] | EL display device | Examination procedure | 22.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 21.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2006 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 02.12.2015 | FR | 02.02.2016 | GB | 02.03.2016 | [2017/10] |
Former [2017/08] | FI | 02.12.2015 | |
GB | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 02.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10144927 ; | [PX]WO0007207 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [PX] 1-36 * page 2, line 13 - line 20 * * page 3, line 10 - line 30 * * page 9, line 13 - page 14, line 28 *; | [E]EP1096568 (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1-36 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10144927 A 19980529 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB CO LTD) [A] 5,14,23,32 * abstract * | Examination | EP0845812 | EP1087448 |